Lizotte v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Brandon Lizotte
Defendant: James LeBlanc, Burl Cain, Richard Peabody, Trish Foster, Cindy Vannoy, Clara Knapps, S. Davis, D. Major, Donna Ott and Cynthia Nicholas
Case Number: 3:2009cv00977
Filed: November 13, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 90 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs state law claims and plaintiffs 28 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Defendants' mo tions for summary judgment, rec.doc.nos. 47 and 84 are granted, and plaintiff's unexhausted claims shall be dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e, and the remaining claims shall be dismissed as being without constitutional merit. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/11/11. (BP)
December 6, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Brandon Lizotte, 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cynthia Nicholas, Clara Knapps, Burl Cain, Donna Ott, D. Major, Cindy Vannoy, Richard Peabody, James Le Blanc, Trish Foster, 84 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Samantha Davis. It is recommended that the Court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs state law claims and that the plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, r ec.doc.no. 28 , be denied. It is further recommended that the defendants motions for summary judgment, rec.doc.nos. 47 and 84 , be granted, dismissing the plaintiffs unexhausted claims, without prejudice, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e, and dismissing his remaining claims as being without constitutional merit, and that this action be dismissed.. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/6/2010. (CMM)
November 23, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pltfs 3 Motion for Injunctive Relief is DENIED, without prejudice to reconsideration of this issue upon dispositive motion or at trial on the merits of the pltfs claim. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 11/23/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lizotte v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lizotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Peabody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clara Knapps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?