Active Mortgage, LLC v. Trans Union, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Active Mortgage, LLC
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC, Credit Plus, Inc. and First American Credco, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00986
Filed: November 17, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2013 220 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER - granting 172 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/20/2013. (LLH)
February 1, 2013 212 Opinion or Order of the Court Ruling and Order regarding 172 MOTION for Attorney Fees Against Plaintiff, Active Mortgage, LLC filed by First American Credco, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel for First Advantage Credco, LLC is to provide copies of its local counsel s attorneys fees bills for this lawsuit to Active Mortgage, LLC within five days of the issuing of this Ruling and Order. Active may then file a supplemental opposition brief within ten days of receiving the bills, solely addressing the issue of reasonableness. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/1/2013. (LLH)
February 15, 2012 170 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 146 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 148 Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims against Trans Union and Credit Plus are dismissed.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/14/2012. (CMM)
April 7, 2011 139 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 134 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff, therefore, has no more remaining claims against Credco, and so Credco is dismissed from the suit. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 04/07/11. (PAH)
November 4, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying in part 124 Motion to Dismiss as it relates to the Court's subject matter jurisdiction; granting in part 124 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing plaintiff's claims for detrimental reliance and breach of the duty of good faith and fair dealing. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/4/10. (BP)
April 5, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Considering the foregoing ruling on the motion for preliminary injunction; the Temporary Restraining Order shall be dissolved. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/5/10. (BP, )
March 31, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Active Mortgage, LLC. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/31/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Active Mortgage, LLC v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Active Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Credco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?