McGrew v. Getsy et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv01022
Filed: December 1, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 51 Motion to Stay/Request for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/24/11. (BP)
January 10, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 42 Motion to Revoke in Forma Pauperis Status and Order to Pay Filing Fee. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff is granted 20 days from the date of this order to pay the court's filing fee in the amount of$350. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that except for proceedings related to the plaintiffs payment of the filing fee, further proceeding in this case are stayed until the plaintiff pays the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/10/2011. (CMM)
March 4, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT...It is ordered adjudged and decreed that the plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust available administrative remedies pursuant to 42 USC 199e(a), and with prejudice to refiling them in forma pauperis status. All other pending motions in this action are hereby dismissed, as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/4/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/4/2010. (LSM, )
January 7, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Carlos A. McGrew...It is recommended that the plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust available administrative remedies pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1997 (a), and with prejudice to refiling them in forma pauperis status.... Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/7/2010. (CMM,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGrew v. Getsy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?