Wallace vs Prince, et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv01027
Filed: December 4, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating 97 Judgment and dismissing this matter as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 05/22/2014. (CGP)
October 1, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER declining to adopt the findings and recommendations in the Magistrate Judge's Report 91 . GRANTING the Petitioner's Second Amended Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus By Prisoner In State Custody 36 and ORDERING IMMEDIATE RELEASE of Petitioner Herman Wallace from State custody. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/1/02013. (PJH)
June 7, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 45 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Stat's 24 Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied and this matter is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings n the petitioner's remaining claims. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 06/06/2011. (NLT)
January 31, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Supplement Record: Within 14 days from the date of this order the petitioner shall file a copy of the brief filed in the Louisiana First Circuit Court of Appeal in conjunction with his application for supervisory writs in State ex rel. Wallace v. Whitley, 1999-0275 (La. App. 1st Cir. 3/29/99). Brief due by 2/14/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/31/2011. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace vs Prince, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?