Camsoft Data Systems, Inc. v. Southern Electronics Supply, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv01047
Filed: December 14, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2015 539 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying in part 504 Motion for Attorney Fees, Expenses and Costs with respect to attorney's fees and referred to the Clerk's Office regarding costs and expenses. Camsoft's 534 Motion for Oral Argument is MOOT. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/5/2015. (LLH) Modified on 2/5/2015 to edit text (LLH).
August 20, 2012 430 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 391 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 399 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 427 MOTION to Alter Judgment Rendered July 27, 2011 filed by Camsoft Data Systems, Inc., MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memora ndum and Affidavit filed by Camsoft Data Systems, Inc., MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CIBER, Inc., MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by Camsoft Data Systems, Inc. ; granting 429 MOTION to Alter Judgment Rendered July 27, 201 1 filed by Camsoft Data Systems, Inc., MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum and Affidavit filed by Camsoft Data Systems, Inc., MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CIBER, Inc., MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by Camsoft Data Systems, Inc... Further, all parties are ORDERED to file briefs as described herein. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 08/16/2012. (KDC)
April 30, 2012 382 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING..The defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 317 , 319 , 320 , 322 are GRANTED and CamSofts Motion 315 is DENIED. CamSoft Motions to Dismiss 324 , 325 , 326 , 327 , 328 , 329 , 330 , 331 , 332 are GRANTED under Rule 12(b )(1). The parties are hereby put on notice that the Court intends to remand those claims to the state court in five (5) days. Any opposition (less than two pages) to this must be filed within three (3) days. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/30/2012. (LSM)
July 27, 2011 313 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying in part 281 Motion for Oral Argument ; granting in part and denying in part 233 Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part 234 Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part 238 Motion to Dismiss ; grant ing in part and denying in part 239 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 240 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 241 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 242 Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and and pltf's claims against these defendants for fraud, LUTPA, and unjust enrichment are DISMISSED 243 Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and pltf's claims against these dft's for fraud, LUTPA, and unjust enrichment are DISMISSED in part 244 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and and pltf's claims against these dft's for fraud, LUTPA, and unjust enrichment are DISMISSED 245 Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part 246 Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/26/2011. (CMM)
July 6, 2011 307 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 296 Motion for Certification of Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/5/2011. (LSM) Modified on 7/6/2011 to edit text (LSM).
May 6, 2011 290 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 223 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Active Solutions, LLC, Brian Fitzpatrick and Henry J. Burkhardt. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/6/2011. (JDL)
November 16, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 169 MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order. The motion is granted insofar as the Legislative Auditor sought to quash the plaintiff's October 1, 2010 subpoena. The motion is denied insofar as the Le gislative Auditor sought a protective order preventing further discovery of the City of New Orleans Compliance Audit Report audit work papers. Plaintiff and the Legislative Auditor shall bear their respective costs incurred in connection with this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/16/10. (BP)
September 15, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CIBER, Inc.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/15/10. (BP, )
September 2, 2010 112 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Defts 91 Motion to Dissolve State Court Writ is GRANTED and the state court writ issued October 29, 2009 is hereby DISSOLVED. This court is willing to consider a motion for sequestration if the parties comply with applicable law. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/1/2010. (JDL, )
August 31, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 98 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff Camsoft has 30 days to amend its petition; otherwise, all claims against Mark Kurt will be dismissed.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/31/2010. (CMM, )
August 12, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING The Court finds CamSofts claims arise out of the Agreement containing a mandatory, valid forum selection clause and that transfer is appropriate under § 1404(a). Accordingly, Tropos motion 72 to transfer to the United States District Co urt in the Northern District of California is hereby GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the claims against Tropos be SEVERED and that the severed claims against Tropos be TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/11/2010. (JDL, )
August 3, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court finds no manifest error in the ruling denying remand and no showing of newly discovered evidence that was unavailable earlier. Further, the Court finds no substantial ground for a difference of opinion regarding the appropriateness of federal question jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1338(a). Accordingly, CamSofts motions to 46 amend and 47 alter the order denying remand are DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/3/2010. (JDL, )
March 4, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 32 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 16 Motion to Remand filed by Camsoft Data Systems, Inc. is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/4/10. (BP, )
February 2, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 16 MOTION to Remand filed by Camsoft Data Systems, Inc. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the plaintiff's Motion for Remand be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/2/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camsoft Data Systems, Inc. v. Southern Electronics Supply, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?