Kemp et al v. CTL Distribution, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv01109
Filed: December 30, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying CTL Distribution, Inc.s 118 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 118 Motion for Summary Judgment on Causation. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/3/2013. (LLH)
March 13, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 69 Motion to Reconsider and Enter Judgment. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Delta Trailer, Inc.'s motion for entry of judgment 68 is hereby DENIED. For the written reasons assigned herein, the Courts previous ruling 67 is h ereby revised to grant CTL's motion for summary judgment 34 in full. It is further ORDERED that Delta Trailer, Inc.s alternative request for leave to file a crossclaim is DENIED as moot. (See Crossclaim, Doc. 79 ).. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/13/2012. (CMM)
November 30, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: DTI's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. CTL's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part to the extent that DTI is required to defend and indemnify CTL unless and until the Court finds CTL was grossly negligent in the underlying wrongful death action by the plaintiffs. The remaining portion of CTL's motion is DENIED. Gulf South's motion to dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/28/11. (DCB)
September 30, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Accordingly, plaintiffs 26 Motion to Amend Order and Stay Proceedings is GRANTED.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/30/2010. (CMM,)
September 16, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Pltfs 39 Third Amended, Supplemental and Restated Complaint is STRICKEN because it was filed without leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/16/2010. (JDL, )
June 24, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 21 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 8 Motion to Remand, filed by Roxann Young, Rona Young Kemp, Carl Young is denied. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/24/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp et al v. CTL Distribution, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?