Collins v. Elayn Hunt Correctional Center

Case Number: 3:2010cv00144
Filed: March 1, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 10 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and this action shall be DISMISSED, without prejudice, as a result of the plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative remedies as mandated by 42 U.S.C. § 1997e. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/20/2010. (JDL, )
February 24, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 4 ; IT IS ORDERED that this matter be TRANSFERRED to the USDC, MDLA. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/24/2010.(rll, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/1/2010.]
January 27, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: RECOMMENDED that the 1 Complaint filed by Alfred Collins, Jr. be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. Objections to R&R due by 2/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 1/27/10.(sek, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/1/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Elayn Hunt Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?