Van Heerden v. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College et al

Case Number: 3:2010cv00155
Filed: March 5, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2012 127 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: 120 Defts MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on van Heerden's Fourteenth Amendment-based 1983 claims is Granted in full. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/27/2012. (JDL)
October 20, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motions for Summary Judgment 87 , 90 , 92 , 94 , 98 ; denying 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/20/2011. (LSM)
June 10, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defamation Claim. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 06/09/2011. (NLT)
January 28, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding De Facto Tenure Claim. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/28/11. (BP)
January 27, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Compel Discovery and that plaintiff, Ivor van Heeden, shall produce supplemental responses, as set forth in the above ruling, within twenty (20) days of this Order. Further, plaintiff and defendants are to bear their own costs with respect to this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 1/27/11. (BP)
June 21, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 31 Motion for New Trial or Relief from Order. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/21/2010. (CMM,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Heerden v. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?