Owens et al v. Ethicon Inc et al

Plaintiff: Darrell Owens and Angela Owens
Defendant: St. Elizabeth Hospital, Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv00190
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER : Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) Motion (doc. 37) is granted insofar as it requests that defendants' motion for summary judgment be denied. Defendants' motion (doc. 33) for summary judgment or, alternatively, for entry of Lone Pine case management order, is denied without prejudice. Defendants are free to file another motion for summary judgment after conclusion of discovery. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/6/10. (BP)
August 11, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 4 Motion to Remand and granting 9 Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/11/2010. (CMM,)
May 20, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 4 MOTION to Remand filed by Darrell Owens, Angela Owens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 5/20/2010. (CMM,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens et al v. Ethicon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Owens
Represented By: Michael Carter Palmintier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Owens
Represented By: Michael Carter Palmintier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Elizabeth Hospital
Represented By: Thomas Richard Temple, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Monique M. Garsaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Monique M. Garsaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?