Jacobs v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Zzeundre Jacobs
Defendant: Kevin Benjamin, N. Burl Cain, James M. LeBlanc, Unknown Lollis, Jimmy Smith, Unknown Valentine and Unknown Ware
Case Number: 3:2010cv00271
Filed: April 21, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2015 200 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 187 Motion in Limine. Plaintiff's Exhibit Nos. 3, 8, 9, 13, 15, 16, 18, 23, 24, 28, and 29 are hereby excluded from evidence. The Court will DEFER ruling on the admissibility of Plaintiff& #039;s Exhibit Nos. 30, 36, and 37 until Plaintiff attempts to offer these documents at trial. The Motion is DENIED as to Plaintiff's Exhibit No. 4, which shall be admissible for the limited purpose of showing the Defendants' knowledge, and the Court shall, if requested, give a limiting instruction as to this exhibit and take judicial notice thereof. Defendants' Motion is DENIED as to Plaintiffs Exhibit No. 20. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/26/2015. (BCL)
March 7, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING adopting the 143 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge as the Court's opinion herein. Plaintiff's 142 Motion for Writ of Mandamus Requesting Declaratory and Injunctive Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/7/2014. (LLH) Modified on 3/7/2014 to edit text (LLH).
March 18, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 83 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. It is ORDERED that pltfs claims asserted against defts Lollis and Ware shall be dismissed for failure of the pltf to serve these defts within 120 days as mandated by FRCP 4(m). FURTHER ORDERED that the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction, that the pltfs 64 Motion for Summary Judgment shall be denied, and that the defts Motions to Dismiss 19 53 shall be granted in part, dismissing the pltfs cla ims asserted against deft James LeBlanc and dismissing all of the pltfs claims asserted against the remaining defts except his claim for monetary damages asserted against the defts in their individualcapacities and his claim for declaratory and injun ctive relief asserted against the defts in their individual and official capacities arising out of the defts alleged deliberate indifference to the pltfs exposure to environmental tobacco smoke. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter shall be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 3/17/2011. (JDL)
April 23, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 4/23/2010. (CMM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zzeundre Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?