McGrew v. Barr

Plaintiff: Carlos A. McGrew
Defendant: Donald Barr
Case Number: 3:2010cv00272
Filed: April 21, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER granting 67 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 60 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. IT IS ORDERED that the order granting the motion for reconsideration is hereby REVERSED and plaitniff's in forma pauperis status is REVOKED; plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order to pay the full filing fee in this matter. Failure to pay the fee within the thirty (30) day period will result in this case being stricken from the record. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 03/22/2011. (Williams, Lysandra)
February 1, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT Adopting 33 Report and Recommendations,,, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge, granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss filed by William Reinbold, Dave Ankenbrand, Katie Ard, Carol Gilcrease, Diane Peabody, Donald Barr. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 02/01/2011. (Williams, Lysandra)
January 11, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff in forma pauperis status REVOKED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff is granted 20 days from the date of this order to pay the court's filing fee in the amount of $350. Signed by Honorable James D. Kirk on 01/11/2011. (Williams, Lysandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGrew v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A. McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?