Gooden v. Regions Bank et al

Plaintiff: Ms. Laura Gooden
Defendant: A-Z Insurance Company, Brandy Ashley and Regions Bank
Case Number: 3:2010cv00299
Filed: April 27, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment and judgment shall issue separately, dismissing this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/31/2012. (PJH)
December 8, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 13 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the plaintiff's 1 complaint filed against defendant Brandy Ashley shall be Dismissed, pursuant to Rule 4(m).. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/7/2010. (CMM)
November 18, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS...It is recommended that the plaintiff's claims against defendant Brandy Ashley be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m). Objections to R&R due by 12/6/2010 Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/18/10. (PJH)
October 29, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss Louisiana's Employment Discrimination Law claim.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/29/2010. (CMM) Modified on 10/29/2010 to edit text. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gooden v. Regions Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-Z Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Laura Gooden
Represented By: Alfred C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?