K&G MEN'S COMPANY, INC. v. Laura Carter; John Doe, d/b/a K&G Men & Women Clothing

Plaintiff: K&G MEN'S COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: Laura Carter; John Doe, d/b/a K&G Men & Women Clothing
Case Number: 3:2010cv00309
Filed: April 30, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 33 Pltfs Motion for Reconsideration and permanently enjoins defts from infringing pltfs mark in accordance with the terms of the Amended Default Judgment accompanying this Ruling. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/15/2010. (JDL)
October 19, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Accordingly, the Court instructs Plaintiff to submit a supplemental memorandum in support of its 33 Motion for Reconsideration (doc. 33) as provided herein. Any response should be filed by Defendants within ten (10) days of Plaintiffs supplemental filing.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/19/2010. (CMM)
September 13, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 29 Motion for Default Judgment..plaintiffs request for attorneys fees in its Motion for Entry of Default Judgment, (doc. 29), is GRANTED. Counsel for plaintiff shall submit a form of judgment for signature by the Court within 10 days.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/13/10. (PAH, ) Modified on 9/14/2010 to mark document as a written opinion(PAH, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K&G MEN'S COMPANY, INC. v. Laura Carter; John Doe, d/b/a K&G Men & Women Clothing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K&G MEN'S COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Mark A. Thurmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Carter; John Doe, d/b/a K&G Men & Women Clothing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?