Spillman v. RPM Pizza, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Toni Spillman
Defendant: Domino's Pizza LLC and RPM Pizza, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00349
Filed: May 20, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2013 241 Opinion or Order of the Court FAIRNESS HEARING: RULE 23(e) FINDINGS: The court finds that the proposed TCPA class action settlement in this case is fair, reasonable and adequate, and in the best interest of the class. The court will issue a final order and judgment approving the settlement. The issue of attorneys fees and costs, and the incentive payment to the class representative, will be addressed in a separate ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 5/23/2013. (LLH)
November 9, 2012 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement and Notice of Certification Order as stated. FURTHER ORDERED that a Final Fairness Hearing set for 3/12/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger. FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by class members due by midnight on 2/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/9/2012. (JDL)
June 17, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER..the 112 motion by plaintiff for leave to file a supplemental memorandum in support of the motion for reconsideration is GRANTED, and for the reasons provided above, as well as for the reasons provided in the Court's Ruling of February 22, 2011, the 85 motion by plaintiff, Toni Spillman, for reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 06/16/11. (PAH)
February 22, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court RULINGS : The motions by defendants, RPM Pizza, LLC (docs. 16 & 65) and Domino's Pizza, LLC (docs. 20 & 63) are GRANTED insofar as the motions seek dismissal of all claims which arose prior to May 20, 2009, and are DENIED otherwise. The motions by defendants for leave to file reply memoranda in further support of the motions to dismiss (docs. 81 & 82) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/21/11. (BP)
November 17, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 62 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 48 Motion to Remand or, Alternatively, Request for Ruling on Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Request for Administrative Closure is (1) denied insofar as the plaintiff so ught an order remanding CV 10-592, (2) denied insofar as the plaintiff sought a determination of whether the Court has subject matter jurisdiction under § 1331, and (3) denied without prejudice insofar as the plaintiff sought an order administratively closing CV 10-592.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/17/10. (BP)
October 26, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 48 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Ruling on Jurisdiction, and MOTION for Administrative Closure filed by Toni Spillman. It is recommended that the plaintiffs Motion to Remand or, Alternatively, Request for Ruling on Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Request for Administrative Closure be (1) denied insofar as the plaintiff sought an order remanding CV 10-592, (2) denied insofar as the plaintiff sought a determination of whether the Court has subject matter jurisdiction under § 1331, and (3) denied without prejudice insofar as the plaintiff sought an order administratively closing CV 10-592. Objections to R&R due by 11/12/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/26/2010. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spillman v. RPM Pizza, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino's Pizza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPM Pizza, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Spillman
Represented By: Christopher K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?