Albemarle Corporation v. The United Steel Workers' on Behalf of AOWU Local 103

Plaintiff: Albemarle Corporation
Defendant: The United Steel Workers' on Behalf of AOWU Local 103
Case Number: 3:2010cv00387
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 50 Motion for Approval of Supersedeas Bond. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/28/2014. (LLH)
March 31, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Final Judgment & Specific Relief. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/31/2014. (CGP) Modified on 3/31/2014 to edit text(CGP).
November 21, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 11 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/20/11. (DCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albemarle Corporation v. The United Steel Workers' on Behalf of AOWU Local 103
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albemarle Corporation
Represented By: I. Harold Koretzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United Steel Workers' on Behalf of AOWU Local 103
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?