Whitaker v. Fedex Freight, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Shirley Whitaker
Defendant: Fedex Corporation and Fedex Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00428
Filed: June 28, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 69 Motion for Reconsideration re 67 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/23/2013. (LLH)
September 26, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment (38) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, such that all of plaintiff's claims are dismissed,with prejudice, with the exception of plaintiff's claim that she was terminated in retaliation forfiling EEOC charges.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/25/2012. (LLH)
December 16, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Compel Discovery. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that defendant shall provide supplemental responses to plaintiffs 5 interrogatory, 19 request for production, and 8 supplemental request for production within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 12/16/2011. (LSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. Fedex Freight, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?