Cargill, Inc. v. Clark et al

Plaintiff: Cargill Incorporated
Defendant: Bayou Current Farms, L.L.C., Brett Michael Clark and Clark Farm #2 L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00487
Filed: July 27, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 40 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs by Cargill, Incorporated. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 03/20/2013. (CGP)
December 10, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court GRANTS Cargill's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment and will pierce the corporate veil finding Clark liable for the actions of Clark Farm and BC Farms. Cargill is advised to file a separate motion for costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/7/2012. (JDL)
October 18, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: 13 Cargill's MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The arbitration award rendered by the NGFA in Case No. 2407 on 10/23/2009, in the amt of $23,400.00 in favor of Cargill, Inc. and against Clark Farm s #2, L.L.C. is hereby CONFIRMED. The parties contract disputes regarding Contract Nos. 27199 and 28340 are hereby SUBMITTED to arbitration by the NGFA. This matter is hereby STAYED pending resolution of the arbitration proceeding ordered herein. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/17/2011. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cargill, Inc. v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayou Current Farms, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Michael Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Farm #2 L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cargill Incorporated
Represented By: George J. Nalley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?