Livermore et al v. Arnold et al

Petitioner: Linda Cervizzi and Frank Livermore
Respondent: Joel Arnold, Sheriff Willie Graves, Catherine T Peever and Scott M Perrilloux
Case Number: 3:2010cv00507
Filed: August 3, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 124 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Joe A. Morgan, M.D. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/18/2013. (SMG)
March 12, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Willie Graves, denying 49 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Willie Graves denying 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Linda Cervizzi Claims filed by Joel Arnold and denying 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Frank Livermore's Claims filed by Joel Arnold. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/12/13. (DCB)
February 1, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Although there are pending motions for summary judgment filed herein, the Court questions whether the Middle District of Louisiana is the proper venue for this action since most if not all of the alleged acts occurred in Independence, Louisiana. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that on or before 2/10/2012, the parties shall set forth as stated herein.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 2/1/2012. (CMM) Modified on 2/1/2012 to edit text. (CMM)
June 1, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER 42 Motion to Compel is GRANTED and pltfs Frank Livermore and Linda Cervizzi shall produce their complete Rule 26 initial disclosures within 10 days of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that defts are entitled to an award of reasonable attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 6/1/2011. (JDL)
February 15, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 36 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 31 Motion to Dismiss filed by Catherine T Peever, Scott M Perrilloux shall be granted and the plaintiffs' remaining claims against Perrilloux and Peever shall be DI SMISSED with prejudice. The case continues relative to plaintiffs' claims against Sheriff Graves and Deputy Arnold. This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for further action as may be required under the facts of this case. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 2/15/11. (BP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livermore et al v. Arnold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joel Arnold
Represented By: Jennifer Dyess Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Willie Graves
Represented By: Jennifer Dyess Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catherine T Peever
Represented By: Patricia D. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott M Perrilloux
Represented By: Patricia D. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Linda Cervizzi
Represented By: Kearney S. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank Livermore
Represented By: Kearney S. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?