Louisiana Generating LLC et al v. Illinois Union Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Louisiana Generating LLC and NRG Energy, Inc.
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00516
Filed: August 9, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2016 384 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Plaintiff's 357 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED as to attorneys' fees and prejudgment interest thereon, in all other respects it is DENIED. LaGen is instructed to file an application for cost with the Clerk of Court to r equest costs and expenses other than attorneys' fees. The attorneys shall file a joint form of judgment containing recalculations of attorneys' fees and prejudgment interest consistent with this opinion. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/13/2016. (JDL)
October 2, 2015 371 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER: This Judgment is a final determination of all claims and defenses raised in this action by all parties, and therefore constitutes a Final Judgment under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Federal Rules of Appell ate Procedure. The parties expressly reserve all appeal rights relative to the rulings addressed by this Final Judgment. This Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes arising under this Judgment, including the pending 357 motion for attorneys fees. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/1/2015. (LLH)
August 5, 2015 356 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: For the foregoing reasons, LA Gen's 327 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and Illinois Union's 298 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. LA Gen's 324 Motion in Limine is also DENIED. Additionally, Illinois Union&# 039;s 349 Motion for Judicial Notice is DENIED. Finally, Illinois Union's 292 Motions for an Extension of the Discovery Deadlines and for a 352 Stay of Summary Judgment Proceedings are also DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/5/2015. (BCL)
March 27, 2014 214 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: LaGen's motion (doc. 161) for attorneys' fees is GRANTED. Furthermore, LaGen's motion (doc. 175) for summary judgment is GRANTED. LaGen is entitled to recover attorneys' fees, defense costs, and interest in the am ount of $11,275,309.64. ILU's Motions (docs. 186 & 187) for Oral Argument and Sealed Motion (doc. 212) for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum and Exhibit are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/26/2014. (JDL)
May 16, 2012 136 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The 115 Motion for New Trial is DENIED but the alternate 115 Motion to Certify under 28 USC 1292(b) is GRANTED. Further, LaGen's pending 113 Motion for Attorney Fees is DISMISSED and may be refiled after the resolution of the appeal. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/15/2012. (JDL)
December 14, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Illinois Union Insurance Company's 73 Motion for Contempt Against Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc. is granted in part, and denied in part. Wells Fargo shall produce the withheld documents responsive to the defendants subpoena within seven days. No objections will be allowed. Defendants request to find Wells Fargo in contempt and for an award of attorneys fees is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/14/2011. (JDL)
September 22, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER as to 8 Motion to Dismiss, Transfer Case, Stay. Accordingly, the motions (10CV516, doc. 8 and 10CV835, doc. 46) to stay, dismiss or transfer based upon venue are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/22/2011. (LSM)
August 12, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Defts 62 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production is denied, without prejudice to renewing its manner-of-production argument after the court rules on the duty to defend issue. Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(B), the deft shall pay to the pltfs, within 14 days, reasonable expenses in the amount of $2,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/12/2011. (JDL)
August 9, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING on 63 Motion to Compel Discovery. Accordingly, the Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery of Reinsurance, Reserves, Similarly Situated Policyholder and Premium Information is denied. Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(B, the plaintiffs shall pay to the defendant, within 14 days, reasonable expenses in the amount of $2,000.00.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/8/2011. (LSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Generating LLC et al v. Illinois Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Generating LLC
Represented By: Linda Sarradet Akchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NRG Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Linda Sarradet Akchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?