Arceneaux v. Rader et al

Plaintiff: Errick Jermaine Arceneaux
Defendant: M. Allen, J. Chase, R. Lowe, E. Mathews, Boyd McCartney, J. Norsworthy, Steve Rader, J. Robinson, J. Sloan, James Stevens and Lane Thomas
Case Number: 3:2010cv00518
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 21 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The claims alleged in the pla's amended complaint are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), the claims against M. Allen and R. Lowe are DISMISSED for failure to timely serve them pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed.R.Civ.P., and this action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 01/18/2011. (NLT)
December 13, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Errick Jermaine Arceneaux. For the reasons set forth in the Magistrate Judge's Report issued 11/3/2010, as supplemented herein, it is the recommendation of the magistrate j udge that the claims alleged in the pla's amended complaint be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), the claims against M. Allen and R. Lowe be dismissed for failure to timely serve them pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed.R.Civ.P., and this action be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/13/10. (BP)
December 9, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 15 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge regarding 9 Defts Motion to Dismiss. The defts motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Further, the pltf is granted 14 days from the ruling on the defts motion to file an amended complaint to specifically identify an occasion when the application of the policy resulted in physical harm to him, identify the correctional officers involved in the application of the policy on that occasion, and allege facts "tailored to an answer pleading the defense of qualified immunity." Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/8/2010. (JDL)
November 4, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 9 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12 (b) (6) and 12 (b) (1) MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12 (b) (6) and 12 (b) (1) filed by James Stevens, E. Mathews, J. Norsworthy, J. Robinson, J. Chase, Lane Thomas, J. Sl oan, Boyd McCartney, Steve Rader. It is recommended that the motion to dismiss be granted. It is further recommended that the plaintiff be granted 14 days from the ruling on the defendants motion to file an amended complaint to specifically identify an occasion when the application of the policy resulted in physical harm to him, identify the correctional officers involved in the application of the policy on that occasion, and allege facts tailored to an answer pleading the defense of qualified immunity.. Objections to R&R due by 11/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/3/10. (PJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arceneaux v. Rader et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Norsworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Errick Jermaine Arceneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?