Bernard v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Larry R Bernard
Defendant: James LeBlanc, Howard Prince and Keith Robinson
Case Number: 3:2010cv00545
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Recover Awarded Costs. FURTHER ORDERED that pltf shall pay assessed costs in the amount of $29.20 to the State of LA, as described. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall deliver a copy of this Order to CIB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 2/21/2012. (JDL)
December 15, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 33 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The defendant's 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED, dismissing the plaintiff's claims, with prejudice, and this action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/15/2011. (LSM)
May 10, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 16 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction, and the defendants 11 and 15 Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED, dismissing the plaintiffs claims asserted against the defendants in their official capacities and dismissing the plaintiffs claims asserted against defendants James LeBlanc and Howard Prince, with prejudice, and this action referred back for further proceedings in connection with the plaintiffs claims asserted against defendant Keith Robinson in the defendants individual capacity. Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2011. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 05/09/2011. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernard v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry R Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?