Smith et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Thomas Rucker, Jonathan Shepherd, Alvin Smith, Apria Smith and Anrea Williams
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00586
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to 4 Ex Parte MOTION to Sever and Proceed Separately filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This action be severed into four separate cases to be captioned as follows: (1) Alvin and Apria Smith v. State Farm Fire and Casua lty Company; (2) Anrea Williams v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company; (3) Jonathan Shepherd v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company; and (4) Thomas Rucker v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. The present action be terminated upon the severance of the above claims into four separate actions and the four resultant actions be assigned to District Judge Brian A. Jackson and to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger. The record of the present action be entered into the record of the four sepa rate actions; Within thirty days of the severance of the claims, plaintiffs shall amend the petition to eliminate all claims other than those asserted by the plaintiff or plaintiffs in that particular action. The provisions of the scheduling order of December 7,2010, shall be applicable to the four actions pending any further order of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/22/2011. (PJH)
December 1, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 8 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 6 Motion to Remand, filed by Thomas Rucker, Jonathan Shepherd, Anrea Williams, Apria Smith, Alvin Smith is DENIED. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/01/2010. (NLT)
October 27, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 6 MOTION to Remand filed by Thomas Rucker, Jonathan Shepherd, Anrea Williams, Apria Smith, Alvin Smith. It is recommended that the pltfs motion to remand be denied. Objections to R&R due by 11/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/27/2010. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Rucker
Represented By: Robert J. Diliberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Shepherd
Represented By: Robert J. Diliberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Smith
Represented By: Robert J. Diliberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apria Smith
Represented By: Robert J. Diliberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anrea Williams
Represented By: Robert J. Diliberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Charles L. Chassaignac, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?