Rodriguez v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Luis Rodriguez
Defendant: Dave Akenbrand, N. Burl Cain, John Larry Calvert and John Doe's
Case Number: 3:2010cv00736
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 98 Report and Recommendations... the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs state law claims, The Court grants 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Chad Oubre, James M. LeBlanc, N. Bu rl Cain, Dave Akenbrand, 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by N. Burl Cain, Dave Akenbrand, and 57 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by John Larry Calvert...dismissing this action with prejudice...Judgment shall be entered.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 09/28/2011. (KDC)
May 25, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 89 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 89 Motion to Stay the Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 5/24/2011. (LSM)
January 18, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery is stayed in this proceeding pending the resolution of the defendants' assertion of the defense of qualified immunity. See Schultea v. Wood, 47 F.3d 1427,1432 (5th Cir. 1995). Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/18/11. (PJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Akenbrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Larry Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?