Buck v. East Baton Rouge Sherriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Corey Wayne Buck
Defendant: William Jenkins, East Baton Rouge Sherriff's Office and Cleve Johnson
Case Number: 3:2010cv00741
Filed: October 27, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims against Defendants, Deputy William "Tanner" Jenkins and Deputy Cleve Johnson, are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/10/2014. (LLH)
September 18, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/14/2012. (LLH)
May 3, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 11 Motion to Dismiss all claims purportedly asserted against the EBR Parish Sheriff's Office are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 04/29/11. (PAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck v. East Baton Rouge Sherriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Sherriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleve Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Wayne Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?