Allen v. Holden et al

Plaintiff: Derrick Jerome Allen
Defendant: Richard Anderson, City of Baton Rouge, Steven Danielson, Director of Dept of Public Works, John Doe, Willie B. Douglas, Melissa Herpich, Mike Herpich, Kip Holden, Rudy Hyde, Elmer Litchfield, Unknown Marrento, Doug Moreau, Rock Perkins and Greg Phares
Case Number: 3:2010cv00753
Filed: November 5, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2012 121 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 119 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs state law claims and the Motions to Dismiss of defendants Elmer Litchfield, Willie R. Douglas, Mik e Herpich, Melissa Herpich and Rudy Hyde 105 and 112 , be granted, dismissing the plaintiffs claims asserted against these defendants, with prejudice. It is further recommended that the plaintiffs claims asserted against defendants Greg Phares, Ro ck Perkins and Sgt. Marrento be dismissed, with prejudice, for failure of the plaintiff to state a claim upon which relief may be granted as to these defendants pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A, and that this action be dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 09/06/2012. (SMG)
October 5, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 78 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge: denying as moot 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kip Holden, City of Baton Rouge, granting 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim f iled by Richard Anderson DISMISSING the plaintiff's claims asserted against this defendant, with prejudice. Further, the plaintiff's claims asserted against the remaining defendants are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A, with the exception of the plaintiff's claim asserted against defendants Sheriff Greg Phares, Sheriff Elmer Litchfield, Warden Willie R.Douglas, Sgt. Mike Herpich, Lt. Rock Perkins, Lt. Melissa Herpich, Sft. Marento and Dpty. Rudy Hyde, in their individu al capacities, that these defendants violated his constitutional rights by housing him in a cell without running water between March 16 and June 1, 2007. This dismissal is made without prejudice to any state law claims which the plaintiff may have. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/5/11. (DCB)
July 14, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 50 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge regarding the 26 Motion to Dismiss which was construed as a motion to quash service. The Court will GRANT the Motion to Dismiss construed as a motion to quash service upo n defendants, giving the plaintiff an additional opportunity to serve the defendants within forty-five (45) days from the date of this ruling. After proper service, proceedings will continue regarding the plaintiff's claim pursuant to 42 U.S.C §1983. Defendants may file all objections pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6 once all process has been completed so as to examine the pleadings. Please note this is not a ruling on the validity of defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) objections. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/13/2011. (JDL)
June 14, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 06/14/11. (PAH)
November 17, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The pltf is determined to be ineligible to proceed in forma pauperis in this case. FURTHER ORDERED that the pltf is granted 21 days from the date of this Order within which to pay $350.00, the full amount of the Courts filing fee. Filing Fee due by 12/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 11/17/2010. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Holden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Jerome Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Dept of Public Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie B. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Herpich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Herpich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kip Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmer Litchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Marrento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Moreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Phares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?