Jones et al v. Fontenot et al

Plaintiff: Willie Foley, John H. Jones and Levon Pinesett
Defendant: John Calvert, Correctional Officers at Camp J and Cathy Fontenot
Case Number: 3:2010cv00806
Filed: December 2, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion for Request in part such that the plaintiffs right to re-assert his claims in a separate civil proceeding is acknowledged, and denying in part, to the extent that the plaintiff seeks entitlement to re-assert the same claim or claims in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 9/19/2011. (CMM)
March 31, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 3/31/11. (BP)
February 16, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 17 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 02/16/11. (PAH)
January 24, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 1/24/2011. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Fontenot et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officers at Camp J
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levon Pinesett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?