Nelson et al v. Louise, et al

Plaintiff: Jerome Nelson, Kathy Nelson, Saluta Nelson, Tasha Nelson and William Nelson
Defendant: Derik Louise
Case Number: 3:2010cv00827
Filed: December 9, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING adopting 37 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiffs' state law claims are declined and plaintiffs' complaint and amended complaint are DISMISSED, with prejudice, for failure to state a claim in accordance with the screening provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B), and without prejudice to any state law claims the plaintiffs may have. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/20/2014. (SMG)
August 17, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 27 Report and Recommendations of the magistrate judge. Accordingly, pltfs' 2 , 3 , 4 , 5 , 6 , applications to proceed in forma pauperis are denied, and the filing and service fee shall be paid by plfs on or before 8/31/20 11. Further, in accordance with the denial of their application to proceed in forma pauperis, pltfs shall be held responsible for service of the summons and complaint/amended complaint upon the dfts.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/16/2011. (CMM)
July 22, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Judge Ralph Tyson and Judge Docia L Dalby to Take Judicial Notice to the Below, Motion to Vacate Magistrate Judge Denying Recusing Herself and Second Request for the Recusal of Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/22/2011. (CMM)
April 15, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion for Recusal of the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 4/15/2011. (JDL)
March 16, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The pltfs motions to proceed in forma pauperis (rec. docs. 2-6) are HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further Order of the court. FURTHER ORDERED that pltfs motion requesting federal marshal service of the complaint (rec. doc. 12) is DISMISSED as prem ature. FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this Order, pltfs must file an amended complaint, not to exceed 20 pages, which describes the specific actions or inactions by specific defts which gave rise to the violation of pltfs rights. Such complaint must be in compliance with FRCP Rule 8 and Local Rule 10.1. Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 3/15/2011. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Louise, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derik Louise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saluta Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?