Broyles et al v. Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph N. Broyles, Eilleen Collins and Steven D Collins, Sr.
Defendant: Thomas Joseph Anzalone, Douglas Rankin Barnard, CA Core Fixed Income Fund, LLC, CA Core Fixed Income Offshore Fund, LTD, CA High Yield Fund, LLC, CA High Yield Offshore Fund, LTD., CA Strategic Equity Fund, LLC, CA Strategic Equity Offshore Fund, LTD, CF Group Management, Inc., CFLP CFS I HOLDINGS, L.P., CFS CF & CO. HOLDINGS, LLC., CFS CF & CO. I HOLDINGS, L.P., Noel Caldwell, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Commonwealth Advisors, Inc., Irvin Goldman, Gina Hubbell, Edward Lascala, William Howard Lutnick, Shawn Peter Matthews, Stephen M Merkel, Jennifer O Morales, Walter A Morales, III, James F O'Beirne, Willie Gerald Warrington, Jr. and Andrew Craig Wells
Unknown: R. Hackney Wiegmann
Movant: Municipal Employees' Retirement System
Case Number: 3:2010cv00857
Filed: December 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1441 - Petition for Removal: Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 239 RULING and ORDER Adopting 235 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice to theright, upon good cause shown within ninety (90) days, to reopen the action if thesettlement is not consummated. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 02/11/2020. (ELW)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 RULING Adopting Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge; adopting 178 Report and Recommendations. The CA Funds Motion to Strike Declarations of Kathy Poe and Mimi Fister [Doc. No. 10-857, R. Doc. 141] is DENIED as MOOT. Further, the Stifle Entities Motion in Limine to Exclude Statements Made by Kathy Poe Regarding Stifle Financials Assumption of Liabilities [Docket No. 10-854, R. Doc. 587] is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/20/2017. (SWE)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 RULING Adopting Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge; adopting 169 . The Defendants Motion In Limine to Exclude Evidence as to One Witness Opinion of AnotherWitness Testimony [R. Doc. 588; Docket No. 10-854] is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/7/2017. (SWE)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RULING Adopting Report and Recommendation of the Special Master; granting 154 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, the Motion to Strike Youngbloods New Expert Opinions (Doc. No. 113) and the Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Consolidated Response on Youngblood (Doc. No. 117) is GRANTED and the declarations of Dr. Youngblood are STRICKEN. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/2/2017. (SWE)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 RULING Adopting the 145 Second Report and Recommendation of the Special Master C. Michael Hill. The 114 Motion to Strike 110 Response is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/18/2017. (LLH)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 RULING Adopting 130 Report and Recommendation of the Special Master. The Motion in limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Edwin Witham (Docket No. 10-854, Rec. Doc. 591) is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Further, the Motion to Strike Expert Reports and Testimony (Docket No. 10-854, Rec. Doc. 586) is terminated as to Mr. Monteleone only. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 06/26/2017. (NLT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broyles et al v. Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Joseph Anzalone
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Rankin Barnard
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA Core Fixed Income Fund, LLC
Represented By: Katia Desrouleaux
Represented By: John Ashley Moore
Represented By: Fredrick R. Tulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA Core Fixed Income Offshore Fund, LTD
Represented By: Katia Desrouleaux
Represented By: John Ashley Moore
Represented By: Fredrick R. Tulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA High Yield Fund, LLC
Represented By: Katia Desrouleaux
Represented By: John Ashley Moore
Represented By: Fredrick R. Tulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA High Yield Offshore Fund, LTD.
Represented By: Katia Desrouleaux
Represented By: John Ashley Moore
Represented By: Fredrick R. Tulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA Strategic Equity Fund, LLC
Represented By: Katia Desrouleaux
Represented By: John Ashley Moore
Represented By: Fredrick R. Tulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA Strategic Equity Offshore Fund, LTD
Represented By: Katia Desrouleaux
Represented By: John Ashley Moore
Represented By: Fredrick R. Tulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CF Group Management, Inc.
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Represented By: R. Hackney Wiegmann
Represented By: Marcie R Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFLP CFS I HOLDINGS, L.P.
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFS CF & CO. HOLDINGS, LLC.
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFS CF & CO. I HOLDINGS, L.P.
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel Caldwell
Represented By: Katia Desrouleaux
Represented By: John Ashley Moore
Represented By: Fredrick R. Tulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P.
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: Katia Desrouleaux
Represented By: John Ashley Moore
Represented By: Fredrick R. Tulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvin Goldman
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Hubbell
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lascala
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Howard Lutnick
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Peter Matthews
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M Merkel
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer O Morales
Represented By: Katia Desrouleaux
Represented By: John Ashley Moore
Represented By: Fredrick R. Tulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter A Morales, III
Represented By: Katia Desrouleaux
Represented By: John Ashley Moore
Represented By: Fredrick R. Tulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F O'Beirne
Represented By: Katia Desrouleaux
Represented By: John Ashley Moore
Represented By: Fredrick R. Tulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Gerald Warrington, Jr.
Represented By: Katia Desrouleaux
Represented By: John Ashley Moore
Represented By: Fredrick R. Tulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Craig Wells
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Jane Robert
Represented By: James H. Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: R. Hackney Wiegmann
Represented By: Marcie R Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph N. Broyles
Represented By: Patrick N. Broyles
Represented By: Charles R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eilleen Collins
Represented By: Patrick N. Broyles
Represented By: Charles R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven D Collins, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick N. Broyles
Represented By: Charles R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Municipal Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Kirk Reasonover
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?