Rice et al v. Reliastar Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Brandon Rice, Brenda Rice, Jessica Rice, Jonathon Rice and Nathan Rice
Defendant: Joel Arnold, Willie Graves and Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff- Consolidated: Brenda Tannehill Rice
Case Number: 3:2011cv00044
Filed: January 25, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2015 126 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 118 Re-Urged Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Other Costs. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/29/2015. (JDL)
September 26, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING - granting 46 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to the extent that the court finds that defendant's decision to deny benefits is a factualdetermination reviewable under ERISA's arbitrary and capricious standard. For reasons explained herein, the preemption argument is moot.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/25/2012. (LLH)
November 10, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: IT IS ORDERED that the motions to quash and for protective order R. Docs. 42 and 43 filed by defendant, Deputy Joel Arnold, are hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth in the above Ruling. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any rec ords produced in response to the subpoenas at issue shall be subject to the terms of a confidentiality order and that the parties shall meet-and-confer to confect a joint motion for entry of such confidentiality order within fifteen (15) days of this Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 11/10/2011. (CMM)
May 26, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 23 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 05/25/11. (PAH)
March 29, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Strike filed by defendants, Willie Graves, Sheriff of Livingston Parish, and Deputy Joel Arnold, is hereby GRANTED IN PART, in that Paragraphs 27 and 29 and Exhibit A of the original complaint shall be struck from the record, and DENIED IN PART, in that Paragraph 28 and Exhibits B, E, and F shall not be struck from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/29/2011. (PJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice et al v. Reliastar Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Arnold
Represented By: Jennifer Dyess Sims
Represented By: Stephen R. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Graves
Represented By: Jennifer Dyess Sims
Represented By: Stephen R. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Represented By: George Davidson Fagan
Represented By: Margaret F. Swetman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Rice
Represented By: Kearney S. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Rice
Represented By: Kearney S. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rice
Represented By: Kearney S. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Rice
Represented By: Kearney S. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Rice
Represented By: Kearney S. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff- consolidated: Brenda Tannehill Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?