Atkins v. Southeast Community Health Systems
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn A. Atkins
Defendant: Southeast Community Health Systems
Case Number: 3:2011cv00047
Filed: January 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RULING AND ORDER granting 82 Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims of Plaintiff Gwendolyn Atkins against Defendant Southeast Community Health Systems are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's state-law claims against all remaining defendants, including Selena Senegal, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/7/2017. (LLH)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RULING AND ORDER granting 56 Motion to Dismiss Counts Two and Three of the First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's malicious prosecution and defamation claims against Dr. Freeman are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/18/2015. (NLT)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: If all of the parties consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, then the consent form signed by all parties shall be filed within 14 days of this Order. Should such unanimous written consent not be filed, the Clerk of Court will assign this matter to a District Judge in this district as the presiding judicial officer and the undersigned will remain as the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/4/2015. (BCL)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay and this matter is STAYED until the criminal charges pending against pltf in 21st JDC, Parish of St. Helena, have been resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 2/3/2012. (JDL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkins v. Southeast Community Health Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn A. Atkins
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Hogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Community Health Systems
Represented By: Amanda Williams Cox
Represented By: Alex J. Peragine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?