Parker v. Webber et al

Plaintiff: Patrick C. Parker
Defendant: Rhonda Shear, Michelle Gaudin, Unknown Holmes, Jeffery F Wiley, Tmothy Maxwell and Bobby Webber
Case Number: 3:2011cv00082
Filed: February 14, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting the 109 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge as the Court's opinion herein. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's state law claims and 93 , 94 and 95 Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/19/2014. (LLH)
May 15, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 89 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge; 83 Motion for Dismissal for Insufficient Service of Process of defendant Steven Holmes, MD is DENIED, and this matter is referred back for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/15/2013. (SMG)
April 24, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 58 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the plaintiff's 56 Motion for Summary Judgment, 54 Motion for Summary Judgment, and 33 Motion for Summary Judgment are hereby DENIED and this matter is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/23/2012. (LSM)
December 5, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Request for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/5/11. (DCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Webber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Shear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Gaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery F Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tmothy Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick C. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?