Fields v. Department of Public Safety et al

Plaintiff: Edwina F. Fields
Defendant: Department of Public Safety and Elayn Hunt Correctional Center
Case Number: 3:2011cv00101
Filed: February 23, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2015 151 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 135 Motion to Vacate 133 Jury Award of Compensatory and Punitive Damages, or in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial on Limited Issue of Damages or Remittitur and 146 Motion to Request Judicial Notice of Prior Ruling on Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 49(b)(3), the jury verdict awarding Plaintiff Edwina Fields $120,000.00 in compensatory damages and $120,000.00 in punitive damages is hereby VACATED. The Court enters judgment in favor of the Defendant, State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Correction, and against the Plaintiff, awarding Plaintiff no compensatory or punitive damages. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 03/30/2015. (BCL)
November 29, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER....Defendants Motion in Limine 94 and objections 115 are granted in part and denied in part, and Plaintiffs Motion in Limine 114 is denied. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 11/29/14. (KDC)
November 7, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 11/6/2014. (SMG)
November 27, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(l) AND 12(b)(6): Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Furthermore, Defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/24/2012. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elayn Hunt Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwina F. Fields
Represented By: Yancy A. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?