Brown v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Lewis E Brown
Defendant: 2 Unknown LSP Pharmacists, Donald Barr, Burl Cain and Jonathon Roundtree
Case Number: 3:2011cv00103
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2015 149 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 138 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/2/2015. (LLH)
September 8, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 123 Motion for a Rule to Show Cause. Defendants shall produce the requested offender pharmacy records as delineated in this Courts 6/13/2014 Ruling within thirty (30) days. The 127 Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum is dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/8/2014. (LLH)
June 3, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 102 Motion in Limine. All objections as to relevance and admissibility of evidence are deferred to trial. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/3/2014. (LLH)
September 7, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 75 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment be denied, that the defendant's motion for summary judgment be granted, and this action be dismissed.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/6/2012. (LH)
October 31, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 39 Motion to Compel Discovery. Defts shall produce documents responsive to the pltfs request for production of documents, without objection, by 11/21/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/31/2011. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 Unknown LSP Pharmacists
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Barr
Represented By: Babatunde Mobolade Animashaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Represented By: Babatunde Mobolade Animashaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon Roundtree
Represented By: Babatunde Mobolade Animashaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?