Mose et al v. Keybank National Association

Plaintiff: Sergio Yibrin, Melanie Zurik, Sam Zurik, Tracey F. Mose, REAA Company, LLC, Rose Ray, Blake Sabadie, Carlos N. Sabadie, III, James F. Tri, Jodi Bertman, Jane Birriel, Tomas Birriel, Steve Blanchard, Faye Boring, James Boring, Daniel Braun, Gordon D. Bush, II, Joanne Carrillo, Juan Carrillo, Patricia Cox, Ralph C. Cox, Jr., Merlie Fuselier, Jessica Spell Gary, Marguerite Graham, Frances Harrell, Guy Harrell, Brian Higgins, Melissa Higgins, Carter Hill, Lauren Hill, Bertha Kern, Nathan Kern, Annette Martin, Miki Martin, Frank W. Miller, Anthony Mose , Jr., Marilyn Tri, Byron Trust, Joy C. Valenti, Orterio Villa, Della Watts and Donald R. Watts
Defendant: Keybank National Association
Plaintiff- Consolidated: Carolyn Ahrens Robards, Craig Cavalier, Steven Cavalier, Shirley Zaglin Cavalier-Rice, Gabriel Hausmann, Jr., Roan Geisenberger Hausmann and Terri T. McGovern
Case Number: 3:2011cv00162
Filed: March 18, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED that judgment be entered in favor of dft Keybank National Association and against pltfs in each of the three consolidated cases-Anthony Mose, Jr., et al v. Keybank National Association, No. 11-cv-162 Gabriel Hausmann, Jr., et al v. Keybank National Association, No. 11-cv-193, and Terri T. McGovern, et al v. Keybank National Association, No. 11-cv-226 and the plts' claims against dft be dismissed.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/4/2011. (CMM)
July 26, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 9 Motion to Dismiss as to all of Plaintiffs' claims.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/25/2011. (CMM) Modified on 7/26/2011 to edit text. (CMM)
July 14, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 19 Pltfs Motion to Disqualify Jones Day as Defts Counsel. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/13/2011. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mose et al v. Keybank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Yibrin
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Zurik
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Zurik
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey F. Mose
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REAA Company, LLC
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Ray
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Sabadie
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos N. Sabadie, III
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F. Tri
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Bertman
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Birriel
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Birriel
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Blanchard
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Boring
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Boring
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Braun
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon D. Bush, II
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Carrillo
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carrillo
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Cox
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph C. Cox, Jr.
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlie Fuselier
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Spell Gary
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marguerite Graham
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Harrell
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Harrell
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Higgins
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Higgins
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Hill
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Hill
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Kern
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Kern
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Martin
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miki Martin
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank W. Miller
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Mose , Jr.
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Tri
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Trust
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy C. Valenti
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orterio Villa
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Della Watts
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R. Watts
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff- consolidated: Carolyn Ahrens Robards
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff- consolidated: Craig Cavalier
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff- consolidated: Steven Cavalier
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff- consolidated: Shirley Zaglin Cavalier-Rice
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff- consolidated: Gabriel Hausmann, Jr.
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff- consolidated: Roan Geisenberger Hausmann
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff- consolidated: Terri T. McGovern
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keybank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?