White v. Lamartiniere et al

Plaintiff: Robert LaTroy White
Defendant: Unknown Barr, Joe Lamartiniere, Troy Poret and W. Richarson
Case Number: 3:2011cv00215
Filed: March 31, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to 22 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint filed by Robert LaTroy White. IT IS ORDERED that the pltf's Motion for Leave to Amend,rec.doc.no. 22 , be and it is hereby DENIED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 2/21/2012. (CMM)
February 16, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 20 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The plaintiff's action is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/16/2012. (LSM) Modified on 2/16/2012 to edit text (LSM).
May 9, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Pltfs Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/9/2011. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Lamartiniere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert LaTroy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lamartiniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Poret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Richarson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?