Sanders et al v. Cain

Plaintiff: T. Carter, Paul Gray, Norman Sanders and R. Washiington
Defendant: Kevin Benjamin, N. Burl Cain, Tim Delaney, Brad Delaughter, Leslie Dupont, Cathy Fontenot, Orville Lamartinere, Richard Peabody, John H Robson and Darrel Vannoy
Case Number: 3:2011cv00227
Filed: April 6, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2016 156 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 154 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge: The plaintiff's 152 Motion for Review and Opposition to Taxation of Cost is DENIED and the defendants' 151 Motion to Recover Awarded Costs is GRANTED. Furth er plaintiff Norman Sanders (#197433) shall pay assessed costs in the amount of $209.90 in periodic installments. The plaintiff is required to make payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to his inmate accounts until he has paid the total assessed costs of $209.90. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/1/2016. (BCL)
March 23, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 136 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The defendants' 126 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, dismissing the plaintiff's remaining claims asserted against the defendant and this action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 03/23/2015. (BCL)
April 1, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 03/29/2013. (CGP)
December 27, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The defendants Motion to Stay Discovery, record document number 36, is granted in part staying all discovery except discovery tailored to addressing the defendants qualified immunity defense. FURTHER ORDERED the plaintiffs Motion to Stay Summ ary Judgment and Motion to Stay, record document numbers 56 and 58, respectively, are granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs Motions to Stay are granted in part, deferring consideration of the defendants Motions for Partial Summary Judgment pending a determination whether additional discovery directed to addressing the defendants qualified immunity defense is required. In all other respects, the plaintiffs motions are denied. FURTHER ORDERED that within 21 days from the date of this or der the plaintiff shall file a Motion for Leave of Court to Propound Discovery and attach the proposed discovery to the motion. The discovery must be tailored to addressing the defendant's qualified immunity defense. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 12/27/2011. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders et al v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Delaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Dupont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orville Lamartinere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Peabody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Robson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Washiington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?