Wilson v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Mondrell Wilson
Defendant: N. Burl Cain, Leslie Dupont and Luke Rheams
Case Number: 3:2011cv00289
Filed: May 3, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 57 Motion for Summary Judgment and 63 Motion for Summary Judgment are denied and this action is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 05/28/2013. (NLT)
February 5, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 58 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. If, within 15 days, the defts do not withdraw the Report as support of their summary judgment motion, the clerk of court will be directed to unseal the Report and the defts will be required to serve the pltf with a copy of it. Alternatively, the defts may re-file their motion, as stated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/5/2013. (JDL)
January 30, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL RULING regarding 52 Order on Motion to Compel. Insofar as the pltf sought to compel the production of Capt. Luke Rheams' Disciplinary Reports, the motion to compel is now denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/30/2013. (JDL)
November 30, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 19 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss 15 is granted and this action shall be dismissed, unless within 14 days from the date of this ruling, plaintiff fil es an amended complaint alleging facts sufficiently to show a claim upon which relief can be granted against defendants. Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Luke Rheams, N. Burl Cain, Leslie Dupont,. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/23/11. (DCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Dupont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Rheams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mondrell Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?