Cook v. Lamont et al

Plaintiff: Demond F. Cook
Defendant: Deputy Unknown Malveaux, Nurse Jane Doe, Sheriff S. Gatreaux, Deputy Unknown Glasper, Warden D. Grimes, Lt. Unknown Harris, Sgt Unknown Lamont and Deputy Unknown Williams
Case Number: 3:2011cv00358
Filed: May 31, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the pltfs state law claims. FURTHER ORDERED that the pltfs 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the defts 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, dismissing the pltfs federal claims, with prejudice, as barred by the applicable statute of limitations, and that this action be dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/25/2013. (JDL)
August 24, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 64 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and the plaintiff's claims asserted against defendants Nurse "Jane Doe" and S. Gautreaux are dismissed for failure of the plaintiff to serve these defendants within 120 days as mandated by FRCP Rule 4(m). The Motion to Dismiss of the remaining defendants, (doc. 45), is denied, and this matter is referred back for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/22/2012. (JDL)
January 19, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion for Court-Appointed Expert, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 1/19/2012. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Lamont et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Unknown Malveaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff S. Gatreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Unknown Glasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden D. Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Unknown Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Unknown Lamont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Unknown Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demond F. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?