Rhodes v. Jackson et al

Plaintiff: Leonard C Rhodes
Defendant: James Dulaney, Unknown Gamble, F. Jackson, Unknown Prince, Unknown Russ, Clay Williams and Unknown Boutte
Case Number: 3:2011cv00370
Filed: June 3, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 62 Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/5/2012. (JDL)
March 28, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Accordingly, the motion for partial summary judgment filed by dfts Howard Prince, Frederick Boutte, Freddie Jackson, James Dulaney, and Clay Williams doc. 13 , the motion for partial summary judgment filed by dft Dr. Matthew Gamble doc. 31 and the motion to dismiss filed by Lt. Jason Russ doc. 55 are GRANTED. Judgment shall issue separately.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/28/2012. (CMM)
August 10, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Staying Discovery granting 14 Motion to Stay Discovery. Schultea v. Wood, 47 F.3d 1427 (5th Cir. 1995). All discovery in the above-entitled case is stayed until the court rules on the dfts' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, or until further order of the court.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/10/2011. (CMM) Modified on 8/10/2011 to mark as written opinion. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dulaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Boutte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard C Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?