Chaney v. Races and Aces et al

Plaintiff: Tony Chaney
Defendant: Mike Caze, Peter Cook, Vanassa Johnson, Races and Aces, Tracer Security, Inc., Richard J. Ward, Jr., Patty Webb, 1 Unknown Correctional Employees, Kenneth Albarez and Scherell Brown
Case Number: 3:2011cv00399
Filed: June 14, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 134 Partial Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 136 and 139 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 03/24/2014. (CGP)
September 20, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 110 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant Tracer Security Services, Inc. is hereby DISMISSED from the lawsuit. In order to bring some semblance of certainty to these proceedings, the only potentially viable issues remaining are: (1.) 42 U.S.C. §§ 1983, 1985(3), 1986, and 1988 claims against (1) Kenneth Albarez, (2) Richard J. Ward, Jr., (3) Patty Webb, and (4) Mike Caze; and (2.) Louisiana Civil Code article 2315, 2316, and 2320 claims against (1) Kenneth Albarez, (2) Richard J. Ward, Jr., (3) Patty Webb, and (4) Mike Caze. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 09/20/2013. (CGP) Modified on 9/20/2013 to edit text (CGP).
August 6, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 85 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge 81 Motion to Vacate, filed by Tony Chaney is GRANTED...Further, the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's state law claims against Rac es and Aces/The Old Evangeline Downs, L.L.C., Scherell Brown, and Vanassa Johnson and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e), plaintiff's claims against Race and Aces/The Old Evangeline Down, L.L.C., Scherell Brown, and Vanassa Johnson is DISMISSED as frivolous. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 08/06/2012. (KDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaney v. Races and Aces et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Caze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanassa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Races and Aces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracer Security, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Ward, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Unknown Correctional Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Albarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scherell Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?