Boatner v. Excel Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Chadwick Boatner , La
Defendant: Excel Group, Inc., Shintech Louisiana, LLC, XYZ Insurance Company and ABC Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv00409
Filed: June 17, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 46 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 08/02/2012. (NLT)
April 3, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 37 Motion to Amend Complaint and Add a New Party and Claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 4/3/2012. (LSM) Modified on 4/4/2012 to change document type (LSM).
September 13, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 19 MOTION for Reconsideration of 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 7 MOTION to Remand, treated as a motion under 59.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/12/2011. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boatner v. Excel Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shintech Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Quincy T. Crochet
Represented By: Jessica Finan
Represented By: Keith Wade McDaniel
Represented By: Heather M. Nagel
Represented By: Lance B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadwick Boatner , La
Represented By: Michael Paul Fruge'
Represented By: Tony Clayton
Represented By: Clayton & Fruge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?