United States of America v. State of Louisiana et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Bruce D. Greenstein, Ruth Johnson, Louisiana Department of Children and Family Services, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals, J. Thomas Schedler and State of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2011cv00470
Filed: July 12, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2016 465 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 457 Motion for Certification of Ruling as Final and Appealable, and the Court declines to certify its Order denying Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 8/29/2016. (LLH)
July 26, 2016 456 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND RULING denying 336 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 340 Motion to Dismiss, 341 Motion to Dismiss, 342 Motion to Dismiss, and 345 Motion to Dismiss; and granting in part and denying in part 346 Motion for Summary Judgment. Other deadlines are in effect as stated herein. A status conference is set for 09/30/2016 @ 9:00 AM for the purpose of selecting a trial date. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 07/26/2016. (EDC)
February 17, 2016 377 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court DENIES the Secretary of State's Combined Memorandum in Opposition to United States Motion for Leave to File Corrected and Inadvertently Excluded Documents Relating to Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 361) and Secretary of S tates Motion to Strike and Exclude Documents, (Doc. 362-1). As such, documents 350, 351, 352, 353, 354, 355, 356, and 360 will not be struck from this cases docket. Furthermore, Defendant will have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to address their possible import, if necessary. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 2/16/2016. (BCL)
January 4, 2016 334 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 288 Motion to Review Magistrate's Order Granting the United States 275 Motion to Compel. The 287 Order issued by the Magistrate Judge is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/4/2016. (LLH)
December 16, 2015 328 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 301 Motion to Compel. The Motion is DENIED in part, because Interrogatory Nos. 4, 5 and 6 are overly broad and unduly burdensome, as they seek every fact and every application of law to fact supporting t he identified allegations. The Motion is GRANTED in part, as set forth above, as the Court finds that the United States has a duty to supplement its previous responses. Such responses shall be provided on or before January 5, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/16/2015. (BCL)
October 21, 2015 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 292 Motion to Quash and/or for a Protective Order. The motion is granted to the extent it seeks issuance of a protective order precluding depositions in this action from occurring on the weeks of November 2, 2015 or November 9, 2015. The court does not reach the issue of whether the subpoenas should be quashed in their entirety. The United States shall reschedule the depositions set to take place on November 2, 9, and 13. Fact discovery closes on De cember 31, 2015, which should provide the United States sufficient time to reschedule these depositions within the existing deadlines. If additional time is needed to conduct any of the five depositions at issue in this Order, the United States may s eek leave for a brief extension of the court's discovery deadline to complete these depositions. Any such motion shall outline the efforts made by the United States to schedule these depositions within the current scheduling deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/21/2015. (BCL)
September 21, 2015 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 275 Motion to Compel. Pursuant to Rule 26(e), the Secretary must supplement its responses to the United States' Request for Production Nos. 1, 3, 4, 5, 6, 12, 14 and 18 with any documents in its possession, custody or control that were not previously provided and are responsive to those discovery requests. The Secretary is specifically ordered to consider documents related to the creation, development and issuance of Executive Order BJ-15-10. Any such supplemental respons es shall be provided on or before October 2, 2015. The Secretary is hereby on notice of its continuing duty to supplement any outstanding discovery responses as set forth above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/21/2015. (BCL)
August 20, 2015 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 248 Supplemental Motion to Compel the Production of Documents Asserted to be Privileged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/20/2015. (BCL)
July 31, 2015 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 246 Motion to Compel a Proper Privilege Log from DHH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 7/31/2015. (LLH)
June 8, 2015 253 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 247 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Louisiana Department of Children and Family Services, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals. The Defendant's Response to the United States' 248 Motion to Compel must be filed by 6/12/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 6/8/470. (LLH)
May 22, 2015 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 231 Motion to Compel a Proper Privilege Log to the extent it seeks an order compelling DHH to produce an entirely revised Privilege Log. The U.S. may file a renewed Motion to Compel by Friday, 5/29/2015, citing up to 40 specific entri es in DHH's privilege log, which are exemplary of the entries it challenges as insufficient. If the U.S. does renew its Motion to Compel, DHH must submit copies of any identified and challenged documents to the Court for in-camera review by Wednesday, 6/3/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 5/22/2015. (SMG)
March 2, 2015 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 201 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 03/02/2015. (BCL)
February 27, 2015 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 202 Motion to Compel Defendant Schedler's Compliance With Discovery Orders and for an Extension of Time to File Any Merits-Based Motions Relating to Defendant Schedler's Phase 1 Discovery Respons es. Defendant Schedler must file a certification with the Court, no later than 3/4/2015, stating that he has provided his supplemental responses in accordance with the Revised Protective Order, the Revised ESI Order, and the Federal Rules of Civil P rocedure. United States must file any Rule 37 discovery motion concerning substantive deficiencies regarding Defendant Schedler's supplemental production no later than 4/1/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 02/27/2015. (BCL)
October 26, 2012 145 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING regarding 128 , 130 and 131 Appeals from Magistrate Judge Dalby's order 127 ruling on discovery motions. The order by Magistrate Judge Dalby dated 8/27/2012 is AFFIRMED. The Court further orders that the parties certify to the court in advance of any further discovery motions that they have held such a conference. The certification shall include the issues discussed, the participants, and the outcome of such discussions. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/25/2012. (JDL)
August 27, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 77 Motion for Protective Order; finding as moot 82 MOTION for Leave to propound additional interrogatories; granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on August 27, 2012. (SR)
March 9, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Because the MJ did not clearly err or act contrary to federal law, the MJ's discovery rulings (Docs. 61, 63) are hereby AFFIRMED and defts appeals (Docs. 64 - 68) are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/9/2012. (JDL)
March 7, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding protocol for production of documents and exchange of ESI. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on March 7, 2012. (SR)
December 1, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The claims against defendants Greenstein, Johnson, DHH and DCFS contained in paragraph 15(a) of the 1 complaint are hereby DISMISSED. The remainder of the motion to dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/1/2011. (LSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. State of Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce D. Greenstein
Represented By: Douglas L. Cade
Represented By: Kimberly L. Humbles
Represented By: Stephen Robert Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Johnson
Represented By: Celia M. Alexander
Represented By: Amy Colby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Children and Family Services
Represented By: Celia M. Alexander
Represented By: Amy Colby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Thomas Schedler
Represented By: Celia R. Cangelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Attorney General's Office - BR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Anna M. Baldwin
Represented By: John Joseph Gaupp
Represented By: Bradley E. Heard
Represented By: Justin Weinstein-Tull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?