Brand Coupon Network, LLC v. Catalina Marketing Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Brand Coupon Network, LLC , LA 70816
Defendant: L. Dick Buell, Catalina Marketing Corp., Joe Henson and Pamela Samniego
Unknown: Robert H Newman, Shawn M Taylor and Liisa M Thomas
Case Number: 3:2011cv00556
Filed: August 15, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/1/2015. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 9/1/2015. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 10/1/2015. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 9/1/2015. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 10/1/2015. Discovery from Experts due by 11/16/2015. Motions shall be filed by 12/16/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 6/23/2015. (LLH)
November 24, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying in part and granting in part 48 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, consistent with the rulings herein. Specifically, the motion is denied for Counts I, II, and IV, and granted for Count V. Defe ndants motion to dismiss Count III is denied with respect to the claim of passing off, and granted with respect to the claims of conspiracy to defraud, theft, conversion, and misappropriation of trade secrets. Plaintiff Brand Coupon's Count V for Tortious Conduct is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE Defendant Catalina's 37 Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/24/2014. (LLH)
September 7, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/6/2012. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brand Coupon Network, LLC v. Catalina Marketing Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brand Coupon Network, LLC , LA 70816
Represented By: Terrence J. Donahue, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel J. McGlynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Dick Buell
Represented By: Bryna J Dahlin
Represented By: Alana O. Fernandez
Represented By: R. Bennett Ford, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalina Marketing Corp.
Represented By: Bryna J Dahlin
Represented By: Alana O. Fernandez
Represented By: R. Bennett Ford, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Henson
Represented By: Bryna J Dahlin
Represented By: Alana O. Fernandez
Represented By: R. Bennett Ford, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Samniego
Represented By: Bryna J Dahlin
Represented By: Alana O. Fernandez
Represented By: R. Bennett Ford, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Robert H Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Shawn M Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Liisa M Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?