Moore v. United Parcel Service Company of Delaware et al

Plaintiff: James Moore
Defendant: United Parcel Service Company of Delaware and United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00619
Filed: September 9, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot 59 MOTION for Leave to File One of Two Documents. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/23/2013. (LLH)
June 21, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion to Strike statements contained in "Plaintiff's Statement of Controverting Facts and Incorporated Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury" and the Investigative Report of Kenneth M. Holmes. Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order to file a corrected statement of facts and a separate declaration. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/20/2013. (LLH)
May 13, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 MOTION for Reconsideration of 29 Order on Motion to Compel filed by James Moore. The court's Order denying the 29 Motion to Compel is hereby REINSTATED regarding the imposition of expenses and fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 5/13/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. United Parcel Service Company of Delaware et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Company of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Moore
Represented By: Avant & Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?