Brown v. Louisiana State Senate et al

Plaintiff: Ann S Brown
Defendant: Louisiana State Senate and Joel T. Chaisson, II
Case Number: 3:2011cv00620
Filed: September 9, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 29 Motion for New Trial and 30 Motion for In Camera Hearing. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/11/2013. (SMG)
August 27, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 20 Motion for Summary Judgment in in favor of the Defendants, and Plaintiffs claims are dismissed with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/27/2013. (LLH)
November 20, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents and Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/20/2012. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Louisiana State Senate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Senate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel T. Chaisson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann S Brown
Represented By: Nelson Dan Taylor, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?