Martinez v. Massey et al

Petitioner: Abraham Martinez
Respondent: Ergon Trucking, Inc., Greenwich Insurance Company and David Massey
Case Number: 3:2011cv00648
Filed: September 21, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: Cause code unknown
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2015 192 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 189 Motion for New Trial on Issue of Jury Awards on Past Medical Expenses and General Damages . Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/20/2015. (LLH)
January 20, 2015 167 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 73 MOTION in Limine Addressing all Objections Made During the Deposition of WALLACE STANFILL JUNE 12, 2012, 74 MOTION in Limine Addressing all Objections Made During the Deposition of WALLACE STANFILL NOVEMBER 25, 2014 and 91 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Limit the Testimony of Wallace Stanfill. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 01/20/2015. (NLT)
January 16, 2015 164 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 72 Motion in Limine addressing All Objections During Deposition of Dr. William Donovan and granting Defendants' 87 Motion in Limine addressing All Objections During Deposition of Dr. William Donovan. The Parties are hereby ordered to redact the deposition of Dr. William Donovan in accordance with this Ruling and the Court's Uniform Pre-Trial Notice. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 01/16/2015. (BCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Massey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ergon Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Darleen Marie Jacobs
Represented By: Donohue Patrick PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greenwich Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather A. Cross
Represented By: Darleen Marie Jacobs
Represented By: Donohue Patrick PLLC
Represented By: Robert Heath Savant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Massey
Represented By: Heather A. Cross
Represented By: Darleen Marie Jacobs
Represented By: Donohue Patrick PLLC
Represented By: Robert Heath Savant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abraham Martinez
Represented By: Darleen Marie Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?