Oxley v. Cain et al

Petitioner: Christopher Oxley
Respondent: N. Burl Cain and James Caldwell
Case Number: 3:2011cv00669
Filed: September 28, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 20 Motion for Relief From Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule 60(d)(2); 28 U.S.C.1655. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/15/2013. (CGP)
September 17, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 16 Motion for Relief from Judgment and Order Pursuant to Fed. Rules Civil Procedure; Rule 60(b). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/17/2013. (LLH)
June 7, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting R&R of the U.S. Magistrate Judge...Granting motion 9 to dismiss and the application for HC relief is DISMISSED as untimely pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §2244(d). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 06/07/2012. (KDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oxley v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Oxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?