Williams v. Honeycutt

Plaintiff: Ronald Williams
Defendant: Edward L Honeycutt
Case Number: 3:2011cv00677
Filed: October 3, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 116 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/17/2015. (LLH)
January 21, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Motion for Reconsideration re 85 Ruling and Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/21/2015. (LLH)
December 16, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 77 Motion in Limine and granting 80 Motion to Strike, Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/15/2014. (LLH)
March 30, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 22 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The defendant's 12 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default is GRANTED, and IT IS ORDERED that the entry of default entered on 2/16/2012 against defendant Edward L. Honeycutt is hereby vacated and set aside, and this matter is referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/30/2012. (LSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward L Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?