Fobbs v. Davis et al

Plaintiff: Raymond C Fobbs
Defendant: Daniel Davis, Unknown Mayhall, John Sanders and Momah Tobe
Case Number: 3:2011cv00700
Filed: October 12, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2015 191 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 122 , 132 and 151 Motions in Limine and denying 123 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 6/12/2015. (LLH)
May 16, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 91 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Defendants' 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment is granted in part. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 05/15/2014. (CGP)
August 24, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 34 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge regarding 29 Defts Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defts Motion for Partial Summary Judgment For Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies is denied. Defendants are hereby prohibited from raising the issue of failure to exhaust administrative remedies in another dispositive motion. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/22/2012. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fobbs v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mayhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momah Tobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond C Fobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?