Willis v. The United States of America

Plaintiff: Pauline Willis and Albert L. Willis
Defendant: Libby Turner, Smitty Bell, Ann Charlton, Kurtis Melnick, Janet Napolitano, The Department of Homeland Security, The Federal Emergency Management Agency and The United States of America
Case Number: 3:2011cv00708
Filed: October 20, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff Albert L. Willis' claims against Defendant Janet Napolitano are DISMISSED. The above-captioned matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. A judgment shall be issued by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/10/2013. (CGP) Modified on 12/10/2013 to edit text (CGP).
June 18, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying as moot 48 Motion Requesting Stay Pending Determination of Motion Seeking Relief from Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60; granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 58 Motion Requesting Reconsideration of Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed Out of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 06/18/2013. (SMG)
February 7, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Ruling and Order: The 33 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on the 32 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff is hereby DENIED. The Court GRANTS Defendant's (Secretary Janet Napolitano) 36 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Pauline Willis' Title VII Claim due to the factual and legal conclusions set forth in this ruling. The Title VII claims asserted by Pauline Willis are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/6/2013. (LLH)
November 9, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying as moot 38 Motion to Compel Discovery. Because pltfs attorney failed to satisfy the Rule 37(a)(1) conference requirement, an award of costs is not warranted under Rule 37(a)(5)(a). Pltfs Second 40 Motion to Compel Discovery is also denied. Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(B), the plaintiffs shall pay to the defendant, within 14 days, reasonable expenses in the amount of $300.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/9/2012. (JDL)
May 14, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this matter against defendants, The United States of America, The Dept of Homeland Security, The Federal Emergency Management Agency, Libby Turner, Ann Charlton, Smitty Bell, Kurtis Melnick, and U.S. Attorney General Eric holder, Jr., are hereby dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/14/12. (DCB)
March 8, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 14 Motion to Strike 13 Defts Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/8/2012. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Libby Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smitty Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Charlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurtis Melnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert L. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?